Novak, Kristine v. JP Morgan Chase

Plaintiff: Kristine A. Novak
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase, National Association
Case Number: 3:2012cv00105
Filed: February 14, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff directed to serve complaint. Proof of service due 5/15/2012. Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Injunctive Relief is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/15/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Procedure for motions for injunctive relief, # 2 Procedure for serving a complaint on a corporation, # 3 Wis. Stat. 801.11, # 4 Notice of lawsuit, # 5 Waiver of summons) (jef),(ps) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/19/2012) (jef).
May 24, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff may have until June 4, 2012, in which to advise the court in writing what steps she has taken to serve her complaint on the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/24/2012. (jef),(ps)
June 13, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. (PAO). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novak, Kristine v. JP Morgan Chase
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine A. Novak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase, National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]