Barlass, Janelle v. City of Janesville

Defendant: City of Janesville and Yuri Rashkin
Plaintiff: Janelle L. Barlass
Case Number: 3:2012cv00256
Filed: April 9, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Rock
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants City of Janesville, Yuri Rashkin dismissing this case with prejudice for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
April 10, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/10/2012. (jef),(ps)
April 24, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing 1 Complaint. (Amended Complaint due 5/7/2012.) Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/24/2012. (jef),(ps)
June 5, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment for defendants Yuri Rashkin and City of Janesville and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/5/2012. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlass, Janelle v. City of Janesville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Janesville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuri Rashkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle L. Barlass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]