Stine, Dale v. United States Postal Service

Defendant: United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Dale W. Stine, Jr.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00264
Filed: April 11, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant United States Postal Service dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 8/15/12. (elc),(ps)
July 30, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff has until August 9, 2012 to submit a letter to the court reporting whether he wishes to pursue this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/26/2012. (jef),(ps)
August 14, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case with prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute or respond to the court's order of July 30, 2012. Plaintiff may move to reopen for good cause shown. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/14/12. (elc),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stine, Dale v. United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale W. Stine, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]