O'Grady, Michael v. Carlson, Tersa et al

Plaintiff: Michael O'Grady
Defendant: Teresa L. Carlson and James L. Santelle
Case Number: 3:2012cv00388
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendants Teresa L. Carlson and James L. Santelle may have until October 17, 2012, to show cause why this case should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/10/2012. (jef),(ps)
November 16, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case as frivolous. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/16/2012. (jef),(ps)
November 20, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the November 16, 2012, order dismissing this case as frivolousis AMENDED so that it is limited to plaintiff Michael O'Grady's claims against defendants Teresa Carlson and James Santelle. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of those two defendants and close this case. (jef),(ps)
November 21, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants Teresa L. Carlson, James L. Santelle dismissing this case as frivolous. (PAO). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Grady, Michael v. Carlson, Tersa et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Grady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa L. Carlson
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Santelle
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]