Wiedenbeck, Harry et al v. Cinergy Health, Inc. et al

Defendant: National Congress of Employers, Inc., Cinergy Health, Inc. and American Medical and Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Harry R. Wiedenbeck and Rhonda L. Wiedenbeck
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00508
Filed: July 18, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Motion to Stay Pending Outcome of Petition for Appeal from Order Denying Class Certification by Plaintiffs Harry R. Wiedenbeck, Rhonda L. Wiedenbeck. All pending deadlines, including the trial date, are STRUCK. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/15/2013. (arw)
February 3, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The court will reserve a ruling on the motion until defendant has had an opportunity to advise the court whether it objects. Response due 2/7/2014. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/3/2014. (arw)
March 6, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 133 Motion to Stay Briefing on Pending Summary Judgment Motions. The briefing schedule on the pending motions is STAYED. On or before 3/20/2014, the parties shall file either (a) a notice of voluntary dismissal of all claims, or (b) a notice of voluntary dismissal of all claims by plaintiffs, American Medical and Life Insurance Company (AMLI) and National Congress of Employers, Inc. (NCE), a motion by plaintiffs for voluntary dismissal of claims against Cinergy, and a motion by AMLI and NCE to dismiss Cinergy's cross-claim for contribution and/or indemnification as moot. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/6/2014. (arw)
June 24, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER requiring jurisdictional brief pleading the actual state of incorporation of each defendant and explaining why and how the jurisdictional amount under the Class Action Fairness Act is satisfied. Plaintiffs' brief is due 7/8/2013. Defendants may file a response brief within seven days of service. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/24/2013. (arw)
September 20, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 42 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23; granting 48 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying 57 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 76 Motion to Supplement; granting 77 Motion to Submit Supplemental Authorities. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/20/2013. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wiedenbeck, Harry et al v. Cinergy Health, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Congress of Employers, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinergy Health, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry R. Wiedenbeck
Represented By: Austin P. Tighe, Jr.
Represented By: Lynn R. Laufenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda L. Wiedenbeck
Represented By: Lynn R. Laufenberg
Represented By: Austin P. Tighe, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]