Rusch, Steven et al v. McCartan, Gary

Plaintiff: Steven J. Rusch, Lorie A. Rusch and Rusch Equipment Sales, LLC
Defendant: Gary McCartan
Case Number: 3:2012cv00521
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiffs Steven J. Rusch and Lorie A. Rusch's claims against defendant Gary McCartan are dismissed without prejudice at this time; and defendant shall certify to the court once payment has been made, at which time, the clerk of court will enter judgment dismissing all claims with prejudice. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/12/2014. (jef),(ps)
May 14, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case with prejudice. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
August 28, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Lorie Rusch to submit an affidavit of indigency by September 19, 2012. Plaintiff Rusch Equipment Sales, LLC may have until September 19, 2012, in which to enter a notice of appearance of a lawyer who will represent this plaintiff in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/27/2012. (jef),(ps)
September 28, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs Steven Rusch and Lorie Rusch's requests to proceed in forma pauperis. $350 filing fee due by 10/19/2012. Plaintiff Rusch Equipment Sales, LLC is DISMISSED without prejudice on the court's own motion. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/28/12. (elc),(ps)
October 22, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiffs have an enlargement of time, 60 days from the date of this order, to serve defendant Gary McCartan. Plaintiffs are directed to serve their complaint on the defendant promptly. By December 18, 2012, plaintiffs are to file proof of service of their complaint on the defendant or tell the court why they cannot do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/19/2012. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rusch, Steven et al v. McCartan, Gary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Rusch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorie A. Rusch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusch Equipment Sales, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McCartan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]