Bryant, Thomas et al v. Stryker Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Bryant and State of Wisconsin - Department of Health Services
Defendant: Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation and Group Health Cooperative of Eau Claire
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00593
Filed: August 16, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal. District Judge William M. Conley recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/18/2012. (lak)
November 16, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER that defendants Stryker Corporation and Stryker Sales Corporation or any other party who wants this case to proceed in federal court may have until November 26, 2012, to show cause why this case should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Any party who wishes to respond may have until December 3, 2012, to do so. If no party responds to this order by November 26, I will remand the case to state court. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/16/2012. (voc)
November 27, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER that this case is remanded to the Circuit Court for Dane County, Wisconsin for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/27/2012. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bryant, Thomas et al v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bryant
Represented By: Paul A. Kinne
Represented By: John L. Cates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin - Department of Health Services
Represented By: Joseph T. Ganzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Represented By: Patricia L. Wheeler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Represented By: Patricia L. Wheeler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Health Cooperative of Eau Claire
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]