KDC Foods, Inc. v. Gray, Plant, Mooty, Mooty & Bennett, P.A. et al

Plaintiff: KDC Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Gray, Plant, Mooty, Mooty & Bennett, P.A., Phillip Bohl, Daniel Tenenbaum, Jennifer Dasari and Attorneys' Liability Assurance Society, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00636
Filed: August 31, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Eau Claire
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2013 158 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity Citizenship due 9/12/2013. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/5/13. (krj)
October 25, 2013 174 Featured Case ORDER denying 29 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 30 defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 153 Motion to Strike plaintiff's 11 declarations; denying as moot 157 Motion to Amend complaint. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/25/13. (krj)
November 5, 2013 181 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Attorneys' Liability Assurance Society, Inc., Phillip Bohl, Jennifer Dasari, Gray, Plant, Mooty, Mooty & Bennett, P.A., and Daniel Tenenbaum. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 11/5/2013. (lak)
December 2, 2013 185 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Appeal Information Sheet, Opinion and Order, Judgment and Docket Sheet to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: 184 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff KDC Foods, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Sheet, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 Opinion and Order, # 4 Judgment, # 5 Docket Sheet) (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: KDC Foods, Inc. v. Gray, Plant, Mooty, Mooty & Bennett, P.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KDC Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Paul Erhard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray, Plant, Mooty, Mooty & Bennett, P.A.
Represented By: Claude J. Covelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Bohl
Represented By: Claude J. Covelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Tenenbaum
Represented By: Claude J. Covelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Dasari
Represented By: Claude J. Covelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorneys' Liability Assurance Society, Inc.
Represented By: Claude J. Covelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]