Wicke, Jeremy et al v. L&C Insulations, Inc.

Plaintiff: John Perry and Jeremy Wicke
Defendant: L&C Insulations, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00638
Filed: August 31, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss; granting 66 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying without prejudice 77 Amended Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23; denying 91 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brie f; denying as moot 117 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 122 Motion to Strike. Defendant L&C Insulation, Inc.'s motion to dismiss is granted with respect to defendant's argument that the court should decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs' state law class claims and denied in all other respects. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/18/2013. (arw)
October 9, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 125 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; denying as moot 126 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23; denying as moot 134 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/8/2013. (arw)
July 1, 2014 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 142 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 187 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying 191 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Legal Autho rity; granting 200 Motion to Strike Reply Brief; denying 207 Motion to Strike Declaration of Yingtao Ho. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is granted with respect to plaintiffs' claim that defendant violated Wisconsin law in calcu lating the overtime rate of pay. Summary judgment is entered in favor of defendant on plaintiffs' claim that defendant violated Wisconsin state law by taking an improper credit for holidays and personal days and for plaintiff Knudson's health insurance benefits. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/10/2014 at 9:00 AM, plaintiffs to initiate the conference call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/1/2014. (arw)
September 12, 2014 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 278 Motion for Court Approval and Implementation of Settlement Agreement. This case is dismissed without prejudice and the Court Trial set for Monday, September 15, 2014 is STRUCK. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/12/2014. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wicke, Jeremy et al v. L&C Insulations, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Perry
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Represented By: Marianne Goldstein Robbins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wicke
Represented By: Marianne Goldstein Robbins
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&C Insulations, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]