Riker, Sean v. Riker, Tayler

Defendant: Tayler Anne Riker
Plaintiff: Sean Anthony Riker
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00641
Filed: August 31, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff no longer need submit two copies of every paper he files with the court, as he indicates that Wisconsin Secure Program Facility removed the "no contact" order and he is now able to serve documents on defendant. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/6/2012. (jef),(ps)
August 12, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 46 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/12/2013. (jef/cc: defendant),(ps)
April 23, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/23/2014. (jef),(ps)
May 15, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/15/2014. (jef),(ps)
September 4, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 10.58 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 9/24/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/4/2012. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Riker, Sean v. Riker, Tayler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tayler Anne Riker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Anthony Riker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]