Citizens Community Federal v. Silver, Freedman & Taff, L.L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Citizens Community Federal
Defendant: Silver, Freedman & Taff, L.L.P., Martin L. Meyrowitz, P.C. and Nancy M. Stiles, P.C.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00648
Filed: September 7, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Eau Claire
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2014 108 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion is GRANTED with respect to Martin L. Meyrowitz, P.C. and DENIED in all other r espects. Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED IN PART as to defendants' obligation to meet the standard of care for "specialists" for the legal malpractice claim and DENIED in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/30/2014. (arw)
February 14, 2014 120 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion in Limine by Defendants Barry P. Taff, P.C., Nancy M. Stiles, P.C., Silver, Freedman & Taff, LLP; denying as moot 115 Motion for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Citizens Community Federal. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/14/2014. (arw)
April 8, 2014 129 Featured Case ORDER directing the parties to respond regarding plaintiff's ability to rely on defendants' alleged violation of 12 C.F.R. § 563.39 as a basis for liability at trial. The parties should be prepared to discuss this issue at the Final Pretrial Conference on 4/10/2014. Written responses are due 4/14/2014. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/8/2014. (arw)
April 18, 2014 140 Featured Case MEMORANDUM on Jury Instructions regarding 12 C.F.R. § 563.39. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/18/2014. (arw)
April 18, 2014 141 Featured Case ORDER denying 139 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Citizens Community Federal. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/18/2014. (arw)
December 30, 2013 81 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Proof of Subject Matter Jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Proof of Subject Matter Jurisdiction due 1/6/2014. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/30/2013. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Citizens Community Federal v. Silver, Freedman & Taff, L.L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Community Federal
Represented By: Christopher P. Banaszak
Represented By: John H. Zawadsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver, Freedman & Taff, L.L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin L. Meyrowitz, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy M. Stiles, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]