Trade Well International v. United Central Bank

Plaintiff: Trade Well International
Defendant: United Central Bank
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00701
Filed: September 26, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Motion for Entry of Default. Granting 99 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by 10/3/2014, as to why its case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. An Evidentiary Hearing for default j udgment is scheduled for 10/16/2014 at 1:00 PM. Attorney Salem's sanction is increased by $500, making the total amount due to UCB $1,000. The Clerk of Court is instructed to accept no further filings in this case from Salem absent leave of the court unless they relate solely to the imposition of this additional sanction against him personally. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/12/2014. (voc)
October 16, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff Trade Well International's claims, declaring the lien entered against the subject property null and void, and entering default judgmentin the total amount of $3,785.90 plus attorney fees and costs. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/16/14. (rep)
September 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/30/2013. (voc)
October 16, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time ; Granting 19 Motion to Compel. A telephone conference will be held on 11/26/2013 at 1:30 PM, before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/15/2013. (voc)
December 4, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Compel. ; granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/4/2013. (voc)
January 3, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Extension of Time to move all damaged equipment and to compel defendant to pay for moving and storing all damaged equipment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/3/14. (krj)
February 18, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion for Entry of Default as to involuntary plaintiffs Dells Lodging Operator, Inc. and Dells Estate LLC. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 2/18/2014. (voc)
April 4, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion to Compel preservation of evidence; granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Strike notice of lien and for further relief; granting 68 Motion to Strike inadmissible portions of declaration of Maurice J. Salem. Attorney Salem held in contempt of court and ordered to pay $500 to clerk of court and defendant's attorneys' fees incurred by filing lien; clerk of court directed to forward order to enforcement authorities responsible for practice of law in states of Wisconsin and New York. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/4/14. (krj)
April 22, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's April 4, 2014, Order by Plaintiff Trade Well International. Denying as moot 74 Motion for Leave to File an appearance and for a two week extension to post bond by Plaintiff Trade W ell International. Attorney Maurice J. Salem is denied admission in this court both now and for the next three years, and the clerk is directed to forward his admission fee to defendant's counsel as credit against his previous $500 sanction entered by this court. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/22/2014. (voc)
April 24, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Order #75, Order #74, Order #72 and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re 76 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Sheet, # 2 Order #75, # 3 Order #74, # 4 Order #72, # 5 Docket Sheet) (voc)
June 17, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion to Supplement Appeal Record ; Setting briefing on 84 Motion to Declare Notice of Lien Void ab Initio. Plaintiff has until 7/30/2014 to file a response to the motion, Defendant may have until 8/20/2014 to file a reply. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/17/2014. (voc)
June 17, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Motion, Brief in Opposition and Order to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re 76 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Supplement the Appeal Record, # 2 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Supplement the Appeal Record, # 3 Order #89) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trade Well International v. United Central Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trade Well International
Represented By: Maurice J. Salem
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Central Bank
Represented By: Robert A. Pasch
Represented By: Brian Patrick Thill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]