Sid Tilstra et al v. Bou-Matic, LLC

Defendant: Bou-Matic, LLC
Plaintiff: Sid Tilstra and Tilstra Dairy Equipment, LTD
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00827
Filed: November 15, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Bou-Matic, LLC dismissing plaintiffs' claim for tortious interference with contract; entered in favor of plaintiff Tilstra Dairy Equipment, Ltd. against Bou-Matic, LLC in the amount of CAD$471,124.00 based on the jury's finding that defendant breached the implied duty of good faith in its dealership agreement with Tilstra Dairy Equipment, Ltd. (SLC/PAO) (arw)
September 19, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 130 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment; denying 131 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 132 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/19/2014. (arw)
October 17, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docketing Statement, Judgment, Order on Post Judgment Motions and Docket Sheet to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: 147 Notice of Appeal by Defendant Bou-Matic, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Sheet, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 Judgment, # 4 Order on Post Judgment Motions, # 5 Docket Sheet) (arw)
October 22, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Amended Docketing Statement, Order, Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: 150 Amended Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Sheet, # 2 Amended Docketing Statement, # 3 Order #145, # 4 Judgment, # 5 Docket Sheet) (lak)
March 4, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Bou-Matic, LLC. The motion is GRANTED as to plaintiffs' claim for tortious interference with contract; that claim is DISMISSED as barred by the statute of limitations. The motion is DENIED as to plaintiffs' claim for breach of contract. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/4/2014. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sid Tilstra et al v. Bou-Matic, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bou-Matic, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sid Tilstra
Represented By: Gary L. Antoniewicz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tilstra Dairy Equipment, LTD
Represented By: Gary L. Antoniewicz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]