Epic Systems Corporation v. KS Information Technologies LLC et al

Defendant: Ramesh Kumar Gangisetti, KS Information Technologies LLC, Subhash Kanukunta, K-Soft Information Technologies, Inc. and K-Soft Infotech Corporation
Plaintiff: Epic Systems Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00848
Filed: November 21, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff Epic Systems Corporation against defendants KS Information Technologies LLC, Subhash Kanukunta, K-Soft Information Technologies, Inc., K-Soft Infotech Corporation and Ramesh Kumar Gangisetti. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/12/2013. (arw)
December 18, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Default Judgment as to KS Information Technologies LLC; entering default as to Subhash Kanukunta. Default Hearing as to Subhash Kanukunta set for 1/15/2014 at 9:00 AM. Proof of attempts at service as to Subhash Kanukunta and proposed default judgment due 1/13/2014. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/18/2013. (arw)
December 31, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION entered in favor of plaintiff Epic Systems Corporation against defendant KS Information Technologies LLC in the amount of $26,568.49. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/31/2013. (arw)
January 15, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION entered in favor of plaintiff Epic Systems Corporation against defendant Subhash Kanukunta in the amount of $26,568.49. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/15/2014. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Epic Systems Corporation v. KS Information Technologies LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramesh Kumar Gangisetti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KS Information Technologies LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subhash Kanukunta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Soft Information Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Soft Infotech Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Systems Corporation
Represented By: Josephine Benkers
Represented By: Anthony A. Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]