Hardy, Charlie v. Stone House Development et al

Defendant: Stone House Development, Angela Brockman and Kasie Setterlund
Plaintiff: Charlie L. Hardy
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00872
Filed: November 30, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER denying plaintiff Charlie L. Hardy leave to proceed on her claims and dismissing her complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Plaintiff may have until May 16, 2013, to submit a proposed amended complaint. If plaintiff submits a revised complaint by that date, I will take the 8 amended complaint under advisement for screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/29/2013. (jef),(ps)
April 1, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER denying 34 Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/1/2014. (jef),(ps)
December 4, 2012 3 Featured Case ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/3/2012. (jef),(ps)
July 16, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER granting defendants 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment for defendants and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/15/2014. (jef),(ps)
January 29, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER denying plaintiff leave to proceed on her claims that defendant Stone House Development threatened to evict her because of her race and retaliated against her for filing a complaint, dismissing her complaint without prejudice for violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Plaintiff may have until February 19, 2013, to submit a proposed amended complaint.
July 16, 2014 60 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hardy, Charlie v. Stone House Development et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone House Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Brockman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasie Setterlund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie L. Hardy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]