Xiong, Wua v. Dittman

Respondent: Dittman
Petitioner: Wua Xiong
Case Number: 3:2012cv00901
Filed: December 7, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner Wua Xiong's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is DENIED as untimely. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/23/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 26, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered denying the petition of Wua Xiong for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 as untimely. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
September 18, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/18/2013. (jef),(ps)
December 26, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the petitioner has until January 16, 2013 to submit a brief explaining why his petition is not barred by the one-year statute of limitations as well as evidence supporting his arguments. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/21/2012. (jef),(ps)
March 6, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner Wua Xiong may have until March 29, 2013, to submit materials in response to this order regarding equitable tolling and procedural default. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/5/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiong, Wua v. Dittman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dittman
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wua Xiong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]