Moerke, Jeffrey et al v. Altec Industries, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Moerke and Wisconsin Power and Light Company
Defendant: Altec Industries, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00903
Filed: December 7, 2012
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 56 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction by defendant Max Heckel. Plaintiff may have until 12/9/2013 to file an amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/26/2013. (voc)
January 7, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER that Wisconsin Power and Light Company is dropped from plaintiff Jeffrey Moerke's complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/7/2014. (voc)
May 9, 2014 64 Featured Case ORDER FOR DISMISSAL with prejudice and approval of settlement. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/9/2014. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moerke, Jeffrey et al v. Altec Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Moerke
Represented By: Robert John Gingras
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Power and Light Company
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Represented By: Bryan J. Cahill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altec Industries, Inc.
Represented By: James Bernard Hood
Represented By: Robert Holmes Hood, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Holmes Hood, Sr.
Represented By: Mark A. Kircher
Represented By: Marcus Allen Wester
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]