Myles, Samuel v. Werlinger, Robert

Petitioner: Samuel Haywood Myles
Respondent: Robert Werlinger
Case Number: 3:2013cv00016
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Marquette
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner to submit Trust fund account statement or $5 filing fee. Trust Fund Account Statement or $5 filing fee due 2/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/30/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 7, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Samuel Myles's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis isDENIED. Petitioner has until February 27, 2013 in which to pay the $5 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/6/2013. (jef),(ps)
April 1, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner may have until April 11, 2013, to inform the court whether he wishes this court to treat his pleading as a petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 or as a complaint in a civil action under federal law. If he chooses to proceed with a civil lawsuit, he must submit no later than April 11, 2013, either a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in the amount of $350; or a request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/1/2013. (jef),(ps)
May 2, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Respondent Robert Werlinger dismissing the case. (PAO/lak). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myles, Samuel v. Werlinger, Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Haywood Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Werlinger
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.