Mott, Lori v. MWI Veterinary Supply, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lori Susan Mott
Defendant: MWI Veterinary Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00032
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Wood
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff Lori Mott may have until September 27, 2013, in which to advise the court in writing what steps she has taken to serve her complaint on the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/18/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 11, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the complaint filed by plaintiff Lori Susan Mott is DISMISSED without prejudice for want of prosecution. The plaintiff is advised that relief from this order may be granted upon a showing of good cause. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/11/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 11, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
January 17, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff directed to serve complaint. Proof of service due 3/18/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/16/2013. (jef),(ps)
June 11, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff must file the signed waiver of service of summons form of her complaint on the defendant or advise the court in writing if she has not received the signed waiver form from the defendant no later than June 20, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/10/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mott, Lori v. MWI Veterinary Supply, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Susan Mott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MWI Veterinary Supply, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]