Wischhoff, Margaret v. City of Madison et al

Defendant: Larry Nelson, Al Larson, Thomas Heikkinen, Kathy Cryan and City of Madison
Plaintiff: Margaret Wischhoff
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00035
Filed: January 17, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court Supplemental Order on Evidentiary Issues. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/27/2014. (lak)
October 8, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants City of Madison, Wisconsin, Kathy Cryan, Thomas Heikkinen, Al Larson, Larry Nelson dismissing the case. (JDP /PAO). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/8/2014. (voc)
July 10, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/9/14. (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wischhoff, Margaret v. City of Madison et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Heikkinen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Cryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Wischhoff
Represented By: Jeff Scott Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]