Lands' End, Inc. v. Genesys Software Systems, Inc.

Defendant: Genesys Software Systems, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Genesys Software Systems, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Lands' End, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lands' End, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00038
Filed: January 17, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Iowa
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Lands' End, Inc. The counterclaims of conversion, misappropriation of trade secrets and injunctive relief filed by defendant Genesys Software Systems, Inc. are dismissed. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/24/2014. (arw)
April 1, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion to Strike Expert Witness Disclosures; denying 52 Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/1/2014. (arw)
April 11, 2014 82 Featured Case ORDER denying 43 Motion to Vacate; denying 49 Request for Cost-Shifting; granting 55 Motion for Protective Order; denying 66 and 73 Motions for Sanctions and Extension of Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/11/2014. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lands' End, Inc. v. Genesys Software Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesys Software Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Sanford Jay Asman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Genesys Software Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Sanford Jay Asman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Lands' End, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Gregor
Represented By: James Alan Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lands' End, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Gregor
Represented By: James Alan Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]