Brozek, Brent v. Dentice, Mike

Defendant: Mike Dentice
Plaintiff: Brent E. Brozek
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00043
Filed: January 18, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/23/2013. (jef),(ps)
April 1, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing 1 Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Amended Complaint due 4/19/2013. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/29/2013. (jef),(ps)
May 28, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER dismissing this case for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/28/2013. (jef),(ps)
May 28, 2013 7 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case. (PAO). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brozek, Brent v. Dentice, Mike
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Dentice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent E. Brozek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]