Pidgeon, Curtis v. Tegels, Lizzie

Petitioner: Curtis J. Pidgeon
Respondent: Lizzie Tegels
Case Number: 3:2013cv00057
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner Curtis Pidgeon may have until December 30, 2013 to submit a six-month trust fund account statement so that the court may assess his financial eligibility for appointment of counsel. The court will schedule a prompt evidentiary hearing following resolution of petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/13/2013. (jef),(ps)
January 23, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that not later than April 11, 2014, each side must file a pre-hearing brief with the court previewing what the court should expect at the evidentiary hearing. Not later than April 18, 2014, each side may file a response to its opponent's first brief. The court shall hold an evidentiary hearing on April 25, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/22/2014. (jef),(ps)
August 29, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. Petitioner is to be released within 60 days of the issuance of this court's mandate unless the state advises the court before then that it intends to provide petitioner a prompt trial. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/29/2014. (jef),(ps)
September 2, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered granting the petition of Curtis Pidgeon for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254. Petitioner is to be released within 60 days of the issuance of this court's mandate unless the state advises the court before then that it intends to provide petitioner a prompt trial. (BBC/PAO). (jef),(ps)
October 1, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re 48 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Information sheet, # 2 Order, # 3 Judgment, # 4 Docket sheet) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pidgeon, Curtis v. Tegels, Lizzie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis J. Pidgeon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lizzie Tegels
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]