McGhee, Laderian v. Suliene, Dalia et al

Defendant: Karen Anderson, Lon Becher, John Doe(s) and Dalia Suliene
Plaintiff: Laderian McGhee
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00067
Filed: January 28, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Portage
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 102 Motion to Strike the Declaration of Glen Heinzl. Plaintiff may have until January 13, 2014 to file a supplemental response to defendants' motions for summary judgment, and defendants may have until January 27, 2014 to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/13/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 12, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motions for summary judgment filed by defendants Dalia Suliene, Karen Anderson and Lon Becher, dkt. ## 30 and 67 , are DENIED with respect to plaintiff Laderian McGhee's claims that defendant Suliene interfered with plaintiff� 39;s MRI arthrogram appointment and failed to treat plaintiff's shoulder pain adequately, in violation of the Eighth Amendment and common law negligence. Defendants' motions for summary judgment are GRANTED in all other respects. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED as to defendants Anderson and Becher. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/12/2014. (jef),(ps)
March 13, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 118 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/12/2014. (jef),(ps)
September 5, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 127 Motion for appointment of replacement counsel. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/5/2014. (elc),(ps)
July 2, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered denying plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. (PAO/lak). (jef),(ps)
January 30, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 86.47 assessed. ( Initial partial filing fee due 2/21/2013.) Plaintiff's 3 Motion to withdraw initial partial filing fee from prison release account is denied as unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/30/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McGhee, Laderian v. Suliene, Dalia et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Anderson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lon Becher
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalia Suliene
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laderian McGhee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]