Sonic Foundry, Inc. v. Astute Technology, LLC

Plaintiff: Sonic Foundry, Inc.
Defendant: Astute Technology, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00087
Filed: February 5, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal. District Judge William M. Conley recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/3/2013. (lak)
July 1, 2013 22 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/1/13 that the parties have until 8/15/2013 to conduct jurisdictional discovery. Further ordering that plaintiff's supplement brief due 9/3/2013 and defendant's reply due 9/17/13. (cc: all counsel) (dmm)
November 22, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/22/13. Further ordering that the parties have 10 days from the date of this order to show cause why the documents filed under seal at Docket 25 , 27 and 29 should remain sealed.(cc: all counsel) (dmm)
November 26, 2013 32 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Astute Technology, LLC dismissing this case without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. (LAK) (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sonic Foundry, Inc. v. Astute Technology, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonic Foundry, Inc.
Represented By: Connor A. Sabatino
Represented By: Ruben J. Rodrigues
Represented By: Allen A. Arntsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astute Technology, LLC
Represented By: Roisin Heather Bell
Represented By: John Noble Giftos
Represented By: Thomas S. Reynolds, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]