Gruenberg, Darrin v. Tetzlaff, Lt. et al

Defendant: Charles Cole, Janel Nickel, Mellissa Roberts, Lt. Tetzlaff, Cathy Jess, Morgan and Gary Hamblin
Plaintiff: Darrin A. Gruenberg
Case Number: 3:2013cv00095
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Strike; denying 19 Motion for Sanctions; denying 22 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel; denying 25 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/29/2014. (nln),(ps)
February 13, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 65.43 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 3/13/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/12/2013. (jef),(ps)
November 14, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/14/2014. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gruenberg, Darrin v. Tetzlaff, Lt. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Cole
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janel Nickel
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellissa Roberts
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Tetzlaff
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jess
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hamblin
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin A. Gruenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]