Kissick, Michael v. Huebsch, Michael et al

Plaintiff: Michael Kissick
Defendant: Michael Huebsch and David Erwin
Case Number: 3:2013cv00099
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff is to promptly file proof of service of the summons, complaint, motion and support documents. Upon receipt of proof, the court will schedule a conference to set deadlines for plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/14/13. (rep)
February 26, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting schedule re: 2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Michael Kissick. Response due 3/19/13. Reply due 4/2/13. Injunctive hearing set for 4/17/13 at 8:00 am. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/26/13. (rep)
April 16, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to adjourn preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/16/2013. (lak)
July 8, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are enjoined from enforcing content-based distinction found in section 3.J and the permitting requirement generally, as applied to events in the Capitol that are anticipated to attract 20 or fewer persons. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/8/13. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kissick, Michael v. Huebsch, Michael et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kissick
Represented By: Allen Steven Porter
Represented By: Laurence J. Dupuis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Huebsch
Represented By: Maria S. Lazar
Represented By: Daniel P. Lennington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Erwin
Represented By: Maria S. Lazar
Represented By: Daniel P. Lennington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]