Sands Wedeward, Susan v. Local 306, National Postal Mail Handlers Union et al

Plaintiff: Susan Ann Sands-Wedeward
Defendant: Local 306, National Postal Mail Handlers Union and John Castagna
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00100
Filed: February 14, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 39:409 Postal Service
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff Susan Ann Sands Wedeward may have until September 25, 2013, in which to provide answers to the questions set out within this order. If she does not do so, her complaint will be dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) as so vague th at defendant Local 306, National Postal Mail Handlers Union, cannot reasonably prepare a response to the allegations. If plaintiff does submit a complaint that gives adequate notice of her claims, I will allow her to proceed on her claims of liability, but I will grant defendant's motion to bifurcate the case, reserving discovery on damages until the issue of liability has been resolved. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/9/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 8, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER that defendant Local 306, National Postal Mail Handlers Union may have until October 28, 2013, in which to file a new response to the claim in plaintiff's amended complaint, as clarified by plaintiff in her submission of September 27, 2013, that defendant did not provide her adequate legal representation after she was injured while at work at the Madison post office on October 29, 2006. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/8/2013. (jef),(ps)
May 16, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 5 Motion for More Definite Statement by Defendants. Plaintiff Susan Ann Sands-Wedeward may have until May 30, 2013 to file an amended complaint that complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Plaintiff's 7 motion for judicial reassignment is denied. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/16/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sands Wedeward, Susan v. Local 306, National Postal Mail Handlers Union et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ann Sands-Wedeward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 306, National Postal Mail Handlers Union
Represented By: Barry Milton Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Castagna
Represented By: Barry Milton Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]