Davis, Jeffrey v. Divine Savior Hospital et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Davis, Jr.
Defendant: Divine Savior Hospital, Jackson, Charles Boursier and Gerald Krumpos
Case Number: 3:2013cv00101
Filed: February 12, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motion by plaintiff Jeffrey M. Davis for a preliminary injunction (dkt. # 4 ) is DENIED. The motion to dismiss by Dr. Gerald Krumpos for insufficient service of process (dkt. # 34 ) is GRANTED. The motion for voluntary dismissal by p laintiff Davis (dkt. # 39 ) is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The motion to dismiss, supplemental motion to dismiss and motion to seal exhibits filed by Divine Savior Hospital, Dr. Boursier and Dr. Jackson (dkt.# 30 , # 32 and # 41 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/24/2014. (jef),(ps)
January 27, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
February 13, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 6.69 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 3/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/12/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis, Jeffrey v. Divine Savior Hospital et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Davis, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divine Savior Hospital
Represented By: Martin Devries
Represented By: Steven P. Sager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Represented By: Martin Devries
Represented By: Steven P. Sager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Boursier
Represented By: Martin Devries
Represented By: Steven P. Sager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Krumpos
Represented By: Martin Devries
Represented By: Steven P. Sager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]