Ajala, Mustafa-El v. Raemisch, Rick et al

Defendant: Brian Kool, Sara Mason, Patrick Brandt, Rick Raemisch, Daniel Westfield, William Pollard, William Swiekatowski, Peter Huibregtse, Craig Tom, Peter Ericksen, Lebbeus Brown, Michael Delveaux, Gary Boughton, Matthew Scullion, Janet Govier and Other John and Jane Doe Actors, and Co-Conspirators
Plaintiff: Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00102
Filed: February 12, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala, formerly known as Dennis E. Jones-El, may have until July 5, 2013, to identify for the court whether he wishes to proceed with Lawsuit #1, Lawsuit #2, Lawsuit #3, Lawsuit #4, Lawsuit #5 OR Lawsuit #6 under the number assigned to this case. Plaintiff may have until July 5, 2013, to advise the court of which other lawsuits he wishes to pursue under separate case numbers, if any, and which lawsuits he will withdraw voluntarily, if any. For any lawsuit th at plaintiff dismisses voluntarily, he will not owe a filing fee. For each lawsuit plaintiff chooses to pursue, he will owe a separate $350 filing fee and will be assessed an initial partial payment. If plaintiff fails to respond to this order by July 5, 2013, I will enter an order dismissing the lawsuit as it presently exists without prejudice for his failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/20/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 31, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER that this case is SEVERED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 20, Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and the court's inherent authority. Plaintiff Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala's claim that defendants Craig Tom and Matthew Scullion used excessive force in the process of transferring plaintiff from the Green Bay Correctional Institution to the Wisconsin Secure Program Facility in February 2007 will proceed as case no. 13-cv-102-bbc. The clerk of court is directed to assign a new case number to plaintiff&# 039;s claim that defendants Tom, Sara Mason, Peter Huibregtse, Gary Boughton, William Pollard and Peter Ericksen subjected plaintiff to unconstitutional conditions of confinement on the alpha unit at the Wisconsin Secure Program Facility from Februar y 2007 to July 2007. The remaining claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to plaintiff's refiling them at a later date. The following defendants are DISMISSED from case no. 13-cv-102-bbc: Daniel Westfield, William Pollard, Peter Ericksen, Michae l Delvaux, Patrick Brandt, William Siwekatowski, Peter Huibregtse, Brian Kool, Sara Mason, Lebbeus Brown, Gary Boughton, Janet Govier and "other John and Jane Doe actors and co-conspirators." I will screen case no. 13-cv-102-bbc in a sepa rate order. Plaintiff is directed to make an initial partial payment in the amount of $19.20 for the new case. I will screen that case in a separate order after plaintiff submits that payment. Plaintiff's motion for an order on class certification and appointment of counsel, dkt. # 19 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/31/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 21, 2013 2 Featured Case ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiffs to submit Trust fund account statements and whether they wish to prosecute this case jointly. Trust Fund Account Statement due and Response to Order due 3/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/21/2013. (jef),(ps)
September 16, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER denying 26 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time; denying plaintiff's 29 motion for leave to file an amended complaint. The portion of the July 31, 2013 order, dkt. # 21 , dismissing the claims against William Swiekatwoski, Gary Boughton, Patrick Brandt, Michael Delvaux and William Pollard relating to the conduct report plaintiff received ("Lawsuit #3") is VACATED. Those claims will proceed as case no. 13-cv-638-bbc. The clerk of court i s directed to open a new case, including plaintiff's complaint, dkt. # 1 , his supplemental pleading, # 29 , his motion for reconsideration and supporting brief, dkt. ## 26 and 28 , this order and the orders in this case dated June 20, 2013, d kt. # 14 , and July 31, 2013, dkt. # 21 . Plaintiff is directed to make an initial partial payment in the amount of $19.20 for the new case. I will screen that case in a separate order after plaintiff submits that payment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/16/2013. (jef),(ps)
December 17, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER granting defendants' 50 Motion for Extension of Time; denying plaintiff's 53 Motion for the Court to Decide the Issue of Exhaustion Without a Reply Brief From Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/17/2013. (jef),(ps)
March 7, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 56 Motion for Reconsideration. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for plaintiff Mustafa-El Ajala's failure to exhaust his administrative remedies. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/7/2014. (jef),(ps)
March 10, 2014 60 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
July 11, 2014 73 Featured Case ORDER denying 63 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment ; denying 69 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/11/2014. (nln),(ps)
March 27, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER that an initial partial filing fee of $19.20 assessed as to plaintiff Mustafa-el K.A. Ajala. Plaintiff Ajala's initial partial filing fee due April 17, 2013. Plaintiff Kamau T.Z. Damali may have until April 17, 2013, in which notify the court whether he wishes to prosecute this action jointly with Ajala and to submit a six-month trust fund account statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/27/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ajala, Mustafa-El v. Raemisch, Rick et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kool
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Mason
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Brandt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Westfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Swiekatowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Huibregtse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Tom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Ericksen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebbeus Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Delveaux
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boughton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Scullion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Govier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other John and Jane Doe Actors, and Co-Conspirators
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]