Yount, John v. Colvin, Carolyn

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: John Wilson Yount, Jr.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00151
Filed: February 28, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: La Crosse
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER reversing and remanding action to Commissioner for further proceedings RE: 8 Social Security Transcript. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/24/2013. (voc)
September 30, 2013 23 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered reversing the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security under sentence four of section 405(g) and remanding case to Commissioner for further proceedings. ( PAO). Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 9/30/2013. (voc)
January 31, 2014 32 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of John Wilson Yount, Jr against Carolyn W. Colvin awarding plaintiff attorney fees and costs under EAJA in the amount of $ 6,400.00. ( PAO). Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 1/31/14. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Yount, John v. Colvin, Carolyn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilson Yount, Jr.
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]