Lopez, Jorge v. Werlinger, Robert

Petitioner: Jorge Valencia Lopez
Respondent: Robert Werlinger
Case Number: 3:2013cv00169
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting respondent's 7 Motion to Dismiss. The petition filed by Jorge Valencia Lopez is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/24/2014. (jef),(ps)
April 24, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered granting respondent's motion to dismiss and dismissing the petition filed by Jorge Valencia Lopez for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 with prejudice. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
March 7, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 3/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/7/2013. (jef),(ps)
May 10, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directed petitioner to show cause, if any, by responding in writing within thirty-one (31) days of the date of this order - that is, not later than June 10, 2013 - why his petition should not be dismissed as barred by the doctrine of procedural default. If petitioner does not respond to this order as directed, then this case may be dismissed for want of prosecution without further notice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/10/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez, Jorge v. Werlinger, Robert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Valencia Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Werlinger
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]