Voigt, Kevin v. Colvin, Carolyn

Plaintiff: Kevin Voigt
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2013cv00170
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming Commissioner decision regarding Social Security benefits RE: 7 Social Security Transcript. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/15/14. (rep)
June 16, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re 26 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Sheet, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 Order being Appealed, # 4 Docket Sheet) (rep)
May 20, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the judgment entered herein on April 15, 2014 is VACATED and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further action consistent with the March 26, 2015 order of the Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/19/2015. (jef)
May 20, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered remanding this case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. (PAO/jef). (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voigt, Kevin v. Colvin, Carolyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Voigt
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.