Advance Cable Company, LLC et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pinehurst Commercial Investments, LLC and Advance Cable Company, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00229
Filed: April 2, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 46 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 79 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 95 Motion for bad faith Discovery; denying as moot 22 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/12/14. (krj)
May 6, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity Citizenship due 5/20/2013. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/6/13. (rep)
June 20, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 104 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion for Clarification. ; denying 131 Motion to Strike ; denying 133 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/20/14. (rep)
June 27, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 136 Motion to Quash. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/27/2014. (voc)
May 10, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity Citizenship due 5/17/2013. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/10/13. (rep)
July 23, 2014 185 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docketing Statement, Order, Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: 181 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Sheet, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 Order, # 4 Judgment, # 5 Docket Sheet) (lak)
August 7, 2014 193 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Cross-Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docketing Statement, Order, Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: 191 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Sheet, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 Order, # 4 Judgment, # 5 Docket Sheet) (lak)
July 26, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Stay by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/26/2013. (arw)
January 2, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/2/14. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Advance Cable Company, LLC et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark W. Rattan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinehurst Commercial Investments, LLC
Represented By: Charles David Schmidt
Represented By: Anthony K. Murdock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advance Cable Company, LLC
Represented By: Charles David Schmidt
Represented By: Anthony K. Murdock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]