Patrick, Millard v. Baenen, Michael

Respondent: Michael Baenen
Petitioner: Millard Patrick, II
Case Number: 3:2013cv00230
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing the petition of Millard Patrick II for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 without prejudice. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
April 8, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner to submit Trust fund account statement or $5 filing fee. Trust Fund Account Statement or $5 filing fee due 4/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 4/8/2013. (jef),(ps)
May 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner is denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis. $5.00 Filing Fee is due by 5/31/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/3/2013. (elc),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick, Millard v. Baenen, Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Baenen
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Millard Patrick, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.