Vue, Kong v. Echo Bridge

Defendant: Echo Bridge
Plaintiff: Kong Pheng Vue
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00243
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: La Crosse
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's 15 second amended complaint for his failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant Echo Bridge Home Entertainment and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/11/2013. (jef),(ps)
September 12, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Echo Bridge Home Entertainment dismissing this case for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
April 10, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/10/2013. (jef),(ps)
April 29, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff Khong Pheng Vue's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing his complaint without prejudice for violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Proposed Amended Complaint due 5/16/2013. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/29/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vue, Kong v. Echo Bridge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Bridge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kong Pheng Vue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]