Williams, Jessie v. Raip

Plaintiff: Jessie Williams
Defendant: Raip
Case Number: 3:2013cv00247
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/17/2014. (nln),(ps)
July 17, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Ralph Froelich granting his motion for summary judgment, dkt. #16. ( PAO/nln) (nln),(ps)
April 11, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 5/3/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/11/2013. (jef),(ps)
May 2, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/2/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Jessie v. Raip
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raip
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]