Bengtson, Daniel v. Capital One Bank

Plaintiff: Daniel R. Bengtson
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Case Number: 3:2013cv00262
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dunn
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying briefing on defendant's 12 motion for partial summary judgmentand partial dismissal. A pretrial conference will be held by telephone onJune 18, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Defendant's counsel is responsible for setting up the call the chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/28/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 25, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant Capital One Bank's 12 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff Daniel R. Bengtson's claims for violations of the Fair Credit Reporting Act, 15 U.S.C. §1681s-2(b), and the Truth In Lending Act, 15 U.S.C. §§ 1601-1667f, and his state law claim for breach of contract (or a defensive claim of accord and satisfaction) are all dismissed with prejudice; and the clerk of the court is directed to enter judgment consistent with the opinion and order and close this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/25/2014. (jef),(ps)
February 26, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Capital One Bank dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bengtson, Daniel v. Capital One Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Bengtson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Represented By: Jessica Zoe Savran
Represented By: Charles F. Webber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]