Melby, Scott v. Colvin, Carolyn W.

Plaintiff: Scott A. Melby
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00268
Filed: April 23, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Sawyer
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Commissioner to advise by 11/10/2014 why remand is not required and why double fees and costs are not awarded to plaintiff. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/9/2014. (arw)
November 18, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Stipulation for Remand for Further Proceedings. This matter is remanded to the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of Section 205 of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/18/2014. (arw)
November 18, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff Scott A. Melby remanding this case to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings pursuant to sentence four of Section 205 of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). (arw)
November 20, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA. Plaintiff awarded attorney fees in the amount of $ 5,500. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/20/14. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Melby, Scott v. Colvin, Carolyn W.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A. Melby
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]