Jenkins, James v. Wiegel, Keith

Plaintiff: James D. Jenkins
Defendant: Keith Wiegel
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00285
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel; setting briefing on 27 Motion to Compel. Defendant's Brief in Opposition due 10/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/21/2013. (jef),(ps)
November 8, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER denying 30 Motion for Sanctions; denying 27 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/5/2013. (jef),(ps)
January 7, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER denying plaintiff's 33 Motion to Compel ; granting defendant's 35 Motion for Protective Order ; granting plaintiff's 39 Motion for Extension of Time to file his response to defendant's motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/7/2014. (elc),(ps)
April 26, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 12.68 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/24/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/26/2013. (jef),(ps)
April 10, 2014 51 Featured Case ORDER denying plaintiff's 43 motion to compel and for discovery sanctions; denying defendant's 47 motion to compel as moot. Defendant's motion for an extension of the dispositive motions deadline, dkt. 47, is GRANTED. This deadline is extended to April 18, 2014. Defendant is directed to submit a copy of the video footage at issue in conjunction with any motion for summary judgment filed by either party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/9/2014. (jef),(ps)
August 28, 2014 71 Featured Case ORDER granting defendant's 52 motion for summary judgment. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant and close this case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/28/2014. (nln),(ps)
August 28, 2014 72 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Keith Wiegel granting his motion for summary judgment. (PAO/nln). (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jenkins, James v. Wiegel, Keith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Jenkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Wiegel
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Represented By: John R. Sweeney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]