Simmons v. USA

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Andre G. Simmons
Case Number: 3:2013cv00287
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Amend 2255 Motion; denying 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 U.S.C. 2255. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/20/2013. (arw)
September 23, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered denying 2255 motion by Andre Simmons. (LAK) (arw)
October 29, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: 18 Notice of Appeal by Petitioner Andre G. Simmons. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Sheet, # 2 Order, # 3 Judgment, # 4 Docket Sheet) (arw)
October 29, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re: 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Petitioner Andre G. Simmons. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/29/2013. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Peter Mark Jarosz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andre G. Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]