Douglas, Roderick v. Wall, Edward et al

Defendant: Edward F. Wall, Jon/Jane Doe, Jim Schwochert, Baynton, B. Dittman, Jeff Pugh, J. Hannula, Christine McCall, Semanko, Kimberly Richardson, Steinke and Unknown Jane/John Doe defendants
Plaintiff: Roderick D. Douglas
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00301
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Chippewa
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff Roderick Douglas's 2 motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Initial partial filing fee of $ 1.60 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 7/22/2013. Plaintiff's 5 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/27/2013. (jef),(ps)
January 23, 2014 16 Featured Case ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice for want of prosecution. The clerk's office shall terminate all pending motions and close this case. Douglas may seek leave to re-open this case only if he pays the initial partial filing fee within ten days of the date of this order. Otherwise, he must re-file his complaint for consideration in a new case if he wishes to proceed with his claims. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/23/2014. (jef),(ps)
January 23, 2014 17 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice for want of prosecution. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
May 6, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 5/28/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/6/2013. (jef),(ps)
June 7, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER dismissing 1 Complaint without prejudice for want of prosecution. The clerk's office shall terminate all pending motions and close this case. Douglas may seek leave to re-open this case only if he pays the filing fee or submits a certified trust fund account statement within ten days. Otherwise, Douglas must re-file his complaint as a new case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/7/2013. (jef),(ps)
June 10, 2013 9 Featured Case JUDGMENT dismissing this case without prejudice for want of prosecution. (PAO). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Douglas, Roderick v. Wall, Edward et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward F. Wall
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon/Jane Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Schwochert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baynton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Dittman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Pugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hannula
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine McCall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Semanko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steinke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jane/John Doe defendants
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick D. Douglas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]