Alicea, Jose et al v. Walls, Edward et al

Defendant: Cindy O'Donnell, Edward F. Walls and William Pollard
Plaintiff: N. A., Jessica Barrera and Jose A. Alicea
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00302
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Jessica Barrera to submit financial affidavit and written confirmation that she wants to proceed with this case jointly. Financial affidavit and written confirmation due 6/26/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/12/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 17, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/17/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 4, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Jessica Barrera may have until February 13, 2014 to advise the court in writing whether she wishes to continue as a plaintiff in this lawsuit or wishes to drop out. If the court does not hear from Ms. Barrera by February 13, 2014, then it will dismiss her from this lawsuit for failure to prosecute it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/3/2014. (jef),(ps)
May 9, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Each plaintiff may have until June 3, 2012, in which to advise the court whether he or she wishes to prosecute this action jointly. Plaintiff Jessica Barrera to submit Financial Affidavit and Plaintiff Jose Alicea to submit an initial partial payment of $123.87 by June 3, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/9/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alicea, Jose et al v. Walls, Edward et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy O'Donnell
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward F. Walls
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Barrera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Alicea
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]