Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.196.90.111

Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.196.90.111
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00318
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae; granting 21 Supplemental Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC may have until 7/24/2013 to file any further response to the amicus brief. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/18/2013. (arw)
September 10, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking Exhibit C from the complaint, sanctioning counsel for plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC. The stay entered in this case is lifted. Plaintiff may have an additional 90 days to take discovery from ISPs and accomplish service. Plaintiff may contact any Doe household it has identified through ISP information. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/10/2013. (arw)
May 28, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sealing complaint and all attachments. Plaintiff must serve copy of this order on ISPs and shall not contact any Doe household which it has identified until the court grants permission to do so. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(c)(3), not later than June 7, 2013, plaintiff shall show cause why Exhibit C to the complaint does not violate Rule 11(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/28/2013. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.196.90.111
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.196.90.111
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary Katherine Schulz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]