Hall, Gable v. Melby, David

Plaintiff: Gable D. Hall
Defendant: David Melby
Case Number: 3:2013cv00385
Filed: May 30, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Portage
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 30 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel; granting defendants' 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant and close this case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/7/2015. (jef),(ps)
January 7, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant David Melby dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
June 5, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit trust fund account statement and court approved complaint form. Trust Fund Account Statement and Complaint form due 6/26/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint forms) (jef),(ps)
June 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 5 for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Initial partial filing fee of $ 8.29 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 7/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/21/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall, Gable v. Melby, David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gable D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Melby
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]