Davis, Glenn v. Josheph, Dr. et al

Defendant: Dr. Chester and Dr. Josheph
Plaintiff: Glenn M. Davis
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00412
Filed: June 11, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Glenn Davis' motion for summary judgment on his Eighth Amendmentclaims (dkt. # 15 ) is DENIED without prejudice as premature. Plaintiff's request for immediate release (dkt. # 15 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice to re-filing in a federal habeas corpus proceeding. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/28/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 5, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. The complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for plaintiff Glenn Davis's failure to exhaust available administrative remedies as required by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/5/2014. (jef),(ps)
August 5, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Dmitriy Chester and Manuel Joseph dismissing this case without prejudice. (jef/jef),(ps)
June 20, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and a trust fund account statement or filing fee. Motion and trust fund account statement or filing fee due 7/11/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/19/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Davis, Glenn v. Josheph, Dr. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Chester
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Josheph
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn M. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]