Mason Companies, Inc. v. John Doe

Plaintiff: Mason Companies, Inc.
Defendant: DEHUA HAN
Case Number: 3:2013cv00693
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 8/27/2014. (voc)
September 17, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Mason Companies, Inc. against Dehua Han, Zhanjie Fen in the amount of $ 32,844.87. (JDP ). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/16/2014. (voc)
November 13, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Finding of Contempt by Plaintiff Mason Companies. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/12/2014. (voc)
November 13, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 41 Motion for Finding of Contempt filed by Mason Companies, Inc. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/12/2014. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason Companies, Inc. v. John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Companies, Inc.
Represented By: William Daniel Schultz
Represented By: Eric Ronald Chad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEHUA HAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]