Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation v. MLSNA Dairy Supply, Inc. et al

Defendant: Mlsna Dairy Supply, Inc. and Phil Mlsna
Plaintiff: Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv00870
Filed: December 19, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating this case with 13-cv-871. The scheduling order in 13-cv-871 will control. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/5/14. (rep)
January 8, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation's 87 motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is GRANTED; defendants Mlsna Dairy Supply, Inc. and Phil Mlsna's request for attorney's fees and costs pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 is DENIED; all claims and counterclaims in this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and the clerk of court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/08/2015. (nln)
January 9, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing all claims and counterclaims with prejudice and denying defendants' request for attorney's fees and costs pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285. (PAO/nln) (nln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation v. MLSNA Dairy Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mlsna Dairy Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Mlsna
Represented By: Michael T. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation
Represented By: Robert L. Wolter
Represented By: Kevin W. Wimberly
Represented By: Amber Neilson Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]