Woods Knoll, LLC v. City of Lincoln, Alabama, The
Plaintiff: Woods Knoll, LLC
Defendant: City of Lincoln, Alabama, The
Case Number: 1:2009cv01219
Filed: June 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Eastern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert B Propst
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 33:1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 213 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/16/2013. (JLC)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 218 MOTION for New Trial Or Motion To Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 11/29/2012. (JLC)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 10/29/2012. (JLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods Knoll, LLC v. City of Lincoln, Alabama, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woods Knoll, LLC
Represented By: John C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lincoln, Alabama, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?