Harris v. CVS Caremark Corporation

Plaintiff: Roger D. Harris
Defendant: CVS Caremark Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv00732
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 120 MOTION for New Trial or Remittitur Pursuant to Rule 59. The Court hereby DENIES the Motion insofar as it seeks a complete new trial, and GRANTS the Motion and hereby ORD ERS a new trial, limited to the issue of damages. Further, the court hereby VACATES its award of $800,000.00. In all other respects, the judgment stands. In light of this Order, the Court finds that all remaining pending motions (docs. 111, 112, 113, 114, 117, and 118) are DENIED as moot and/or premature. The Court will, by separate Order, set a final Pretrial Conference for the new trial on damages only. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 5/1/2014. (JLC)
February 25, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER DENYING 119 RENEWED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/25/2014. (JLC)
January 29, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment as set out herein. The Court will set a Final Pretrial Conference by separate Order. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/29/2013. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. CVS Caremark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger D. Harris
Represented By: Carl S O'Neal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Caremark Corporation
Represented By: Christopher W Deering
Represented By: Samantha K Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?